US HB2489 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oregon Caves Revitalization Act of 2013 - Redesignates the Oregon Caves National Monument as the Oregon Caves National Monument and Preserve. Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to transfer certain land identified as proposed addition lands to the Secretary of the Interior (the Secretary) and adjust the boundary of the Rogue River-Siskiyou National Forest to exclude such lands transferred by the Secretary. Directs the Secretaries to accept the donation of a grazing lease or permit from a lessee or permittee for the Big Grayback Grazing Allotment located in the Rogue River-Siskiyou National Forest or the Billy Mountain Grazing Allotment located on a parcel of BLM-managed land. Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate the subterranean segment of the Cave Creek in Oregon known as the River Styx as a component of the national wild and scenic rivers system and certain additional segments of the Monument and Preserve for study for potential addition to the system.
Title
Oregon Caves Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB354 (Related) 2014-12-22 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-713.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2489/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2489/BILLS-113hr2489ih.pdf |