US HB2537 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs for Urban Sustainability and Training in America Act of 2011 - Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to make additional grants to: (1) cities with high unemployment (with a population of at least 600,000 and an unemployment rate greater than the national unemployment rate) for public works, training, and economic development projects, as well as for economic adjustment; and (2) firms adversely affected by import competition which are assisted under the Trade Adjustment Assistance for Firms (TAAF) Program. Directs the Secretary of Labor to make grants to carry out adult and dislocated worker employment and training activities under the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 in cities with high unemployment. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to deny a tax deduction for income attributable to the domestic production, refining, processing, transportation, or distribution of oil, gas, or any primary products thereof by a major integrated oil company (an oil company which has an average daily worldwide production of crude oil of at least 500,000 barrels for the taxable year, and which had gross receipts in excess of $1 billion for its last taxable year ending during calendar year 2005).
Title
Jobs for Urban Sustainability and Training in America Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2011-08-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology. |
2011-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1689 (Related) 2011-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Income tax deductions
Labor and employment
Oil and gas
Trade adjustment assistance
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Income tax deductions
Labor and employment
Oil and gas
Trade adjustment assistance
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2537/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2537/BILLS-112hr2537ih.pdf |