US HB2559 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Homeless Heroes Act of 2011 - Allows grants made by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) for homeless veterans' comprehensive services programs (outreach, rehabilitation, vocational counseling, and transitional housing assistance) to be used for the construction of new facilities. Prohibits the Secretary from denying applications for such grants solely on the basis that the grant entity proposes to use funding from other private or public sources, as long as such entity demonstrates that a private nonprofit organization will provide project oversight and site control. Revises eligibility: (1) under the grant program for entities serving homeless veterans with special needs, and (2) for treatment and rehabilitation of homeless veterans who are not seriously mentally ill. Includes all individuals caring for minor dependents (current law applies only to women caring for minor dependents) within the definition of "homeless veterans with special needs." Directs the Secretary to submit to Congress a comprehensive plan to end homelessness among veterans. Requires the plan to consider circumstances and requirements unique to veterans located in rural areas. Extends provisions concerning: (1) homeless veterans' health care to December 31, 2012; (2) centers for provision of comprehensive services and property transfers for housing assistance to December 31, 2014; and (3) the Advisory Committee on Homeless Veterans to December 30, 2013.
Title
Helping Homeless Heroes Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] |
Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1148 (Related) 2011-06-08 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB5830 (Related) 2012-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5830 (Related) 2012-05-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Mental health
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Mental health
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2559/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2559/BILLS-112hr2559ih.pdf |