US HB2620 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful Purpose and Self Defense Act This bill modifies the definition of "armor piercing ammunition" for purposes of federal firearms provisions to: (1) include a projectile that is designed and intended by the manufacturer or importer for use in a handgun; (2) exclude a projectile that is primarily intended by the manufacturer or importer to be used in a rifle or shotgun and a handgun projectile that is designed for hunting, recreational, or competitive shooting. This bill repeals a prohibition on assembling from imported parts a semiautomatic rifle or shotgun that is identical to one prohibited from importation as not being suitable for or readily adaptable to sporting purposes. This bill repeals the condition that the Attorney General must approve, as suitable for sporting purposes, the shipment of firearms or ammunition to members of the Armed Forces. The following categories of firearms or ammunition may be authorized for importation into the United States by the Attorney General: (1) ammunition that is not armor piercing; (2) a firearm or ammunition that is being brought in for the use of a federal, state, or local government agency; and (3) a firearm or ammunition that is being imported for the purpose of exportation. The definition of "destructive device" for purposes of federal firearms provisions excludes: (1) a shotgun or shotgun shell which the Department of the Treasury finds is generally recognized as particularly suitable for lawful purposes, and (2) an antique or a rifle which the owner intends to use for sporting purposes. The bill authorizes certain temporary interstate transfers of firearms for lawful purposes.
Title
Lawful Purpose and Self Defense Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Firearms and explosives
Hunting and fishing
Military personnel and dependents
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions
Firearms and explosives
Hunting and fishing
Military personnel and dependents
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2620/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2620/BILLS-115hr2620ih.pdf |