US HB2632 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-23)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-41.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-23)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-41.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Korean War Veterans Recognition Act - Adds National Korean War Veterans Armistice Day, July 27, to the list of days on which the flag of the United States should be displayed.
Title
Korean War Veterans Recognition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Became Public Law No: 111-41. | |
2009-07-27 | Signed by President. | |
2009-07-27 | Presented to President. | |
2009-07-24 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-07-24 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-07-24 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8101) | |
2009-07-22 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2009-07-21 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-21 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 604). (text: CR 7/20/2009 H8379) | |
2009-07-21 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8457-8458) | |
2009-07-20 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-07-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2632. | |
2009-07-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8379-8381) | |
2009-07-20 | Mr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Government operations and politics
National symbols
North Korea
South Korea
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Government operations and politics
National symbols
North Korea
South Korea
U.S. history