US HB2662 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Inspector General Act of 1978, and for other purposes.
Title
Inspector General Independence Act Inspector General Protection Act Integrity Committee Transparency Act of 2021 IG Subpoena Authority Act Inspector General Access Act Enhanced Whistleblower Engagement Act Inspector General Training Enhancement Act IG Testimonial Subpoena Authority Act Inspector General Access Act of 2021 Securing Inspector General Independence Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - On passage (Y: 221 N: 182 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A002) H.Amdt.63 (Y: 219 N: 184 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - On agreeing to the Comer amendment (A003) H.Amdt.64 (Y: 182 N: 220 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A002) H.Amdt.63 (Y: 219 N: 184 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - On agreeing to the Comer amendment (A003) H.Amdt.64 (Y: 182 N: 220 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-226. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-29 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 182 (Roll no. 195). |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.64 On agreeing to the Comer amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 220 (Roll no. 194). |
2021-06-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.63 On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 184 (Roll no. 193). |
2021-06-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Comer amendment No. 4, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.64 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-06-29 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 504, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Comer amendment No. 4. |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.64 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Comer. (consideration: CR H3287, H3288-3289; text: CR H3287) |
2021-06-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) amendment en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.63 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-06-29 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 504, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) amendment en bloc No. 1. |
2021-06-29 | House | H.Amdt.63 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. (consideration: CR H3284-3287, H3287-3288; text: CR H3284-3286) |
2021-06-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2662. |
2021-06-29 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2662, H.R. 3005, H.R. 3684 and H. Res. 503. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2662, under a structured rule; one hour of general debate on H.R. 3005, under a closed rule; 90 minutes of general debate on H.R. 3684; and one hour of general debate on H. Res. 503, under a closed rule. Resolution provides en bloc suspension authority. |
2021-06-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 504. (consideration: CR H3276-3290; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H3276-3279) |
2021-06-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 504 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2662, H.R. 3005, H.R. 3684 and H. Res. 503. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2662, under a structured rule; one hour of general debate on H.R. 3005, under a closed rule; 90 minutes of general debate on H.R. 3684; and one hour of general debate on H. Res. 503, under a closed rule. Resolution provides en bloc suspension authority. |
2021-06-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 47. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-66, Part I. |
2021-05-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 18. |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Related) 2021-01-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2089 (Related) 2021-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR504 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3338 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB3064 (Related) 2021-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB587 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
SB3148 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2089 (Related) 2021-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR504 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3338 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB3064 (Related) 2021-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB587 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
SB3148 (Related) 2021-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.