US HB2675 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Became Public Law No: 111-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Became Public Law No: 111-30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act - Amends the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to extend through June 22, 2010, provisions of that Act limiting civil damages in antitrust enforcement actions involving conduct covered by antitrust leniency agreements.
Title
Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Became Public Law No: 111-30. | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by President. | |
2009-06-19 | Presented to President. | |
2009-06-18 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-06-17 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-06-17 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6741) | |
2009-06-10 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2009-06-09 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-09 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6329) | |
2009-06-09 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2675. | |
2009-06-09 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6329-6330) | |
2009-06-09 | Mr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-06-03 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1219 (Related) 2009-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6382)
SB3259 (Related) 2010-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2650)
HB5330 (Related) 2010-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 111-190.
SB3259 (Related) 2010-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2650)
HB5330 (Related) 2010-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 111-190.