US HB2710 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Education Act of 2009 - Requires the President to establish, in the Office of Science and Technology Policy, a Committee on Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Education (STEM education) within the National Science and Technology Council. Establishes an Office of Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Education in the Department of Education, to be administered by an Assistant Secretary. Requires the Assistant Secretary to conduct at least every five years an evaluation of the STEM education programs administered by the department. Requires the Secretary of Education to award a grant to establish a voluntary State Consortium on STEM Education and a grant to the National Science Digital Library to establish the STEM Education Resource Alliance.
Title
Enhancing Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Education Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2009-06-10 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Science Education. | |
2009-06-08 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1340) | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to House Science and Technology | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Science and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6248 (Related) 2010-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Department of Education
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Libraries and archives
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Department of Education
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Libraries and archives
Performance measurement
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2710/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2710/BILLS-111hr2710ih.pdf |