US HB2719 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-245.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-245.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Security Acquisition Reform Act - (Sec. 3) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Administrator of the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to: develop and update biennially a strategic five-year technology investment plan, which may include a classified addendum to report sensitive transportation security risks, technology vulnerabilities, or other sensitive security information; and publish the plan in an unclassified form in the public domain. Directs the Administrator, before acquiring any security-related technology, to analyze whether acquisition is justified. Requires the Administrator, 30 days before any TSA award of a contract for acquisitions exceeding $30 million, to report to Congress the results of the analysis and certify that the transportation security benefits justify the contract cost. Requires the appropriate TSA acquisition official to establish certain performance baseline requirements before any TSA security-related technology acquisition. Requires that official to review and assess each acquisition for meeting the baseline requirements and to report the results to Congress. Requires the Administrator, before procuring additional quantities of equipment to fulfill a TSA mission need, to utilize, to the extent practicable, any existing units in the TSA's inventory to meet that need. Directs the Administrator to report annually to Congress on TSA's performance record in meeting its goals for contracting with small businesses. Directs the Administrator to execute all responsibilities set forth in this Act in a manner consistent with the Federal Acquisition Regulation and TSA policies and directives. (Sec. 4) Directs the Comptroller General (GAO) to: (1) assess TSA's implementation of GAO recommendations regarding the acquisition of security-related technology made before enactment of this Act, and (2) evaluate TSA's progress in implementing this Act. (Sec. 5) Directs the Administrator to report to Congress on the feasibility of tracking TSA security-related technology, including software solutions, through automated information and data capture technologies. (Sec. 6) Directs the GAO to evaluate TSA's testing and evaluation process relating to security-related technology. (Sec. 7) Declares that no additional appropriations are authorized to carry out this Act.
Title
Transportation Security Acquisition Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 425 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 416 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 416 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-245. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 559). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8969-8970) |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8992-8993) |
2014-12-10 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2719. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2719. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Mr. Hudson moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8968-8973) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | S.AMDT.3978 Amendment SA 3978 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | S.AMDT.3978 Amendment SA 3978 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Ayotte. (consideration: CR S6401)In the nature of a substitute. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6401) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2013-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 616). (text: CR H7409-7411) |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7427) |
2013-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2719. |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7409-7414) |
2013-12-03 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 196. |
2013-11-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-275. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security. |
2013-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1893 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 599.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security