US HB2733 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Savanna's Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Savanna's Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-06-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB227 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback