US HB2742 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish and maintain a registry for certain individuals who may have been exposed to per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances due to the environmental release of aqueous film-forming foam on military installations.
Title
PFAS Registry Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3967 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR950 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3967 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR950 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2742/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2742/BILLS-117hr2742ih.pdf |