US HB2795 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FRIENDS Act First Responder Identification of Emergency Needs in Disaster Situations (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to submit a report that describes select state and local programs and policies related to the preparedness and protection of first responders, which may include information on: the degree to which such programs and policies include consideration of the presence of a first responder's family in an area impacted by a terrorist attack, the availability of personal protective equipment for first responders, and the availability of home Medkits for first responders and their families for biological incident response. The GAO may provide information: (1) in a format that delineates high risk urban areas from rural communities; and (2) on the degree to which the selected state and local programs and policies were developed or are being executed with funding from the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), including grants from the State Homeland Security Grant Program or the Urban Area Security Initiative. DHS shall consider the report's findings and assess its applicability for federal first responders.
Title
FRIENDS Act First Responder Identification of Emergency Needs in Disaster Situations
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 396 N: 12 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 12 (Roll no. 689). (text: CR H9257-9258) |
2015-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9264-9265) |
2015-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2795. |
2015-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9257-9262) |
2015-12-10 | House | Mr. Hurd (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282. |
2015-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-370. |
2015-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Terrorism
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Terrorism