US HB2813 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, the Public Health Service Act, and the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude from the definition of health insurance coverage certain medical stop-loss insurance obtained by certain plan sponsors of group health plans, and for other purposes.
Title
Self-Insurance Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 88. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-114, Part I. |
2023-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 18. |
2023-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3799 (Related) 2023-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.