US HB2817 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Historic Preservation Amendments Act (Sec. 2) This bill extends the Historic Preservation Fund through FY2023. The Department of the Interior may accept nominations by federal agencies for the inclusion of properties on the National Register of Historic Places only in accordance with the nomination requirements described by this bill.
Title
National Historic Preservation Amendments Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576. |
2016-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-740. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |