US HB2819 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gold Star Families National Monument Extension Act Gold Star Families National Monument Extension Act This bill extends through January 2, 2027, the authority of the Gold Star Mothers National Monument Foundation to establish a commemorative work in honor of Gold Star families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold Star Families National Monument Extension Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193.
2019-10-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-243.
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-07-18HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-05-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-05-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1673 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback