US HB2825 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immigration Slush Fund Elimination Act of 2015 This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act (INA) to provide that the following fees shall be miscellaneous receipts to be deposited in the general fund of the Treasury: asylum fees, nonimmigrant nurse fees, employer fees, additional employer fees, Department of State and Department of Homeland Security fraud prevention and detection fees, visa waiver program fees, temporary protected status fees, adjustment of status fees, administrative fines and penalties, the genealogy fee, the premium fee for employment-based petitions and applications, biometric entry and data system fees, and nonimmigrant foreign student fees. Authority for the visa waiver program travel promotion fee is extended through September 30, 2015. Fee disposition provisions are revised. Fee revenues in all of the accounts under section 286 of INA, as of the day before the date of enactment of this Act, shall be transferred to the general fund of the Treasury on the effective date provided for by this Act. All of the accounts authorized under such section (including the Immigration User Fee Account and the Land Border Inspection Account), as of the day before the date of enactment of this Act, shall be terminated on such date.
Title
Immigration Slush Fund Elimination Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1593 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Foreign labor
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health personnel
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Nursing
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health personnel
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Nursing
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2825/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2825/BILLS-114hr2825ih.pdf |