US HB2828 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to extend for up to six years the time period during which construction must commence on the Enloe Hydroelectric Project located on the Similkameen River in Okanogan County, Washington. Additionally, FERC shall reinstate the construction license if it is expired.
Title
To extend the deadline for commencement of construction of a hydroelectric project.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-07-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5937) |
2017-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2828. |
2017-07-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5937-5938) |
2017-07-18 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-06-08 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E795-796) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
Washington State
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Licensing and registrations
Washington State