US HB2863 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Oral Health Rehabilitative Enhancement Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to permit physical therapy to be furnished under the Medicare program to individuals under the care of a dentist.
Title
Medicare Oral Health Rehabilitative Enhancement Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-09-12 | House | Referred for a period ending not later than September 12, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned. |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2824 (Same As) 2011-08-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2863/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2863/BILLS-112hr2863ih.pdf |