US HB2864 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Secure and Trusted Communications Networks Act of 2019 to provide for the addition of certain equipment and services produced or provided by DJI Technologies to the list of covered communications equipment or services published under such Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Countering CCP Drones Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] |
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2864/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2864/BILLS-118hr2864ih.pdf |