US HB2922 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 113-62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through December 29, 2019, the authority of the Marshal of the Supreme Court and the Supreme Court Police to protect, in any state, the Justices of the Supreme Court, any official guest of the Supreme Court, and any officer or employee of the Supreme Court performing official duties.
Title
To extend the authority of the Supreme Court Police to protect court officials away from the Supreme Court grounds.
Sponsors
Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 3 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-62. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8605) |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-11-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 3 (Roll no. 572). (text: CR H6974) |
2013-11-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6978) |
2013-11-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-11-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2922. |
2013-11-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6974-6975) |
2013-11-12 | House | Mr. Holding moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186. |
2013-11-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-259. |
2013-09-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-09-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-09-10 | House | Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2013-08-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |