US HB293 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-12)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to prohibit the export or sale of petroleum products from the Strategic Petroleum Reserve to certain entities, and for other purposes.
Title
Banning Oil Exports to Foreign Adversaries Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-01-12 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H212) |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB432 (Related) 2023-01-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
SB4020 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
SB4020 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/293/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr293/BILLS-118hr293ih.pdf |