US HB2960 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TALENT Act To Aid Gifted and High-Ability Learners by Empowering the Nation's Teachers Act This bill amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require state assessments of student proficiency to measure individual academic achievement, including above grade level achievement. States must: (1) assist their local educational agencies (LEAs) and schools in providing additional educational assistance to advanced, gifted, and talented students; and (2) report annually a comparison of the performance of students between different LEAs at each level of achievement, disaggregated by specified student subgroups. LEAs must identify gifted and talented students and support their learning needs and train educators to implement instructional practices that support their education. The Institute of Education Sciences must: (1) continue research and development activities regarding the education of gifted and talented students; (2) support a National Research and Dissemination Center on the Gifted and Talented; (3) administer demonstration grants that enhance the ability of educators to support gifted and talented students; and (4) ensure that statistical data regarding the education of gifted and talented children is collected, reported, analyzed, and disseminated.
Title
TALENT Act To Aid Gifted and High-Ability Learners by Empowering the Nation's Teachers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2015-08-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Same As) 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Census and government statistics
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Higher education
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Science and engineering education
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Census and government statistics
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Higher education
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Science and engineering education
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2960/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2960/BILLS-114hr2960ih.pdf |