US HB2977 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Privacy Protection Act of 2015 This bill makes it a crime to intentionally and willfully conceal knowledge of a security breach involving sensitive personally identifiable information (PII). If the breach results in economic harm of at least $1,000 to any individual, then a violator is subject to a fine and/or five years in prison. The legislation authorizes the Department of Justice (DOJ) to seek a civil injunction to prevent ongoing conduct that damages 100 or more protected computers during any one-year period. A protected computer is a government computer, a bank computer, or a computer used in or affecting interstate or foreign commerce or communication. It also authorizes DOJ to seek an injunction or restraining order to prevent disposition of property obtained as a result of such a violation. The legislation expands the list of money laundering predicate offenses to include financial transactions that involve proceeds of unlawful manufacturing, distribution, possession, and advertising of wire, oral, or electronic communication intercepting devices. This bill requires certain commercial entities to implement a comprehensive consumer privacy and data security program. Commercial entities must notify any U.S. resident whose PII has been, or is reasonably believed to have been, accessed or acquired. PII includes electronic or digital forms of personal, financial, health, and biometric data, geographic location, and password-protected photographs and videos. It sets forth provisions regarding: (1) methods and content of notification of a security breach; (2) entities exempt from notification requirements; and (3) notification to consumer credit reporting agencies, law enforcement entities, and the Federal Trade Commission (FTC). It authorizes DOJ, the FTC, and states to enforce civil violations. DOJ and states may seek monetary or injunctive relief, and the FTC may seek monetary relief. The bill does not establish a private right of action.
Title
Consumer Privacy Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2577-2578)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2977/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2977/BILLS-114hr2977ih.pdf |