US HB2988 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to modify and enhance protections for Federal Government whistleblowers, and for other purposes.
Title
Whistleblower Protection Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-15 - House - On passage (Y: 221 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A001) H.Amdt.314 (Y: 224 N: 206 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - House - On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A001) H.Amdt.314 (Y: 224 N: 206 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-09-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 203 (Roll no. 437). |
2022-09-15 | House | The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2022-09-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-09-15 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2988. |
2022-09-15 | House | H.Amdt.314 On agreeing to the Maloney, Carolyn B. amendments (A001) Agreed to by recorded vote: 224 - 206 (Roll no. 436). |
2022-09-15 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on agreeing to an amendment, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2022-09-15 | House | The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration. |
2022-09-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7860-7862) |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 2988 as unfinished business. |
2022-09-14 | House | On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-09-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved that the committee rise. |
2022-09-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Maloney demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-09-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1339, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Carolyn B. Maloney en bloc amendment. |
2022-09-14 | House | H.Amdt.314 Amendments en bloc (A001) offered by Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. (consideration: CR H7830-7833; text: CR H7830-7831) |
2022-09-14 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2988. |
2022-09-14 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Earl Blumenauer to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2022-09-14 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 1339 and Rule XVIII. |
2022-09-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 302, H.R. 2988 and H.R. 8326. Rule provides for one hour of general debate each for H.R. 302, H.R. 2988, and H.R. 8326. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2022-09-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1339. (consideration: CR H7825-7833; text: CR H7825-7831) |
2022-09-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1339 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 302, H.R. 2988 and H.R. 8326. Rule provides for one hour of general debate each for H.R. 302, H.R. 2988, and H.R. 8326. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit on each bill. |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-334. |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
SB2921 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR838 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1339 (Related) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2921 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR838 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1339 (Related) 2022-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.