US HB3008 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
George W. Bush Childhood Home Study Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the childhood home of former President George W. Bush, which is located at 1412 West Ohio Avenue in Midland, Texas. Interior shall: (1) evaluate the national significance of the site, (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the site as a unit of the National Park System (NPS), and (3) determine the effect of the site's designation as an NPS unit on existing commercial and recreational uses and the effect on state and local governments to manage those activities.
Title
George W. Bush Childhood Home Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 427 (Y: 382 N: 4 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 4, 2 Present (Roll no. 427). (text: CR H9776) |
2018-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9803-9804) |
2018-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3008. |
2018-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9776-9777) |
2018-12-10 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 470. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-616. |
2018-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
U.S. history
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
U.S. history