US HB3058 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend parts B and E of title IV of the Social Security Act to improve foster and adoptive parent recruitment and retention, and for other purposes.
Title
Recruiting Families Using Data Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-01-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 1/17/2024 CR H173-174) |
2024-01-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-01-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H229) |
2024-01-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-01-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Feenstra objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2024-01-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3058. |
2024-01-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H173-175) |
2024-01-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-01-17 | House | Mr. Feenstra moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-01-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283. |
2024-01-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-347. |
2023-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 0. |
2023-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1313 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.