US HB307 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preserving America's Battlefields Act This bill reauthorizes though FY2028 the Battlefield Acquisition Grant Program and expands the purposes of the American Battlefield Preservation Program to include the preservation and protection of nationally significant battlefields of not only the Civil War but also the American Revolution and the War of 1812, and the enhancement of visitors' experiences at those battlefields.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserving America's Battlefields Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB225 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback