US HB310 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 117-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 117-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To posthumously award the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to Glen Doherty, Tyrone Woods, J. Christopher Stevens, and Sean Smith, in recognition of their contributions to the Nation.
Title
To posthumously award the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to Glen Doherty, Tyrone Woods, J. Christopher Stevens, and Sean Smith, in recognition of their contributions to the Nation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-256. |
2022-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083) |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2022-07-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7129) |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 310. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7129-7131) |
2022-07-26 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1408 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.