US HB3150 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Agriculture, through the Farm Service Agency, to use specified funds under the Act of August 24, 1935 to compensate poultry producers whose production contracts were terminated or not renewed during the period beginning on July 1, 2008, through the date of the enactment of this Act, because of processing plant closure and other cost cutting measures undertaken by a poultry processing company in bankruptcy protection.
Title
To require the Secretary of Agriculture to use section 32 of the Act of August 24, 1935, to provide compensation to certain poultry producers whose poultry production contracts were terminated or not renewed because of the closure of poultry processing plants and other cost cutting measures undertaken by a poultry processing company in bankruptcy protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Bob Etheridge [D-NC] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] |
Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] |
Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry. | |
2009-07-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Subjects
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agriculture and food
Bankruptcy
Contracts and agency
Food industry and services
Meat
Agriculture and food
Bankruptcy
Contracts and agency
Food industry and services
Meat
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3150/BILLS-111hr3150ih.pdf |