US HB316 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Collinsville Renewable Energy Production Act - Authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request of the town of Canton, Connecticut (Town), to: (1) reinstate the expired license for either or each of the projects numbered 10822 and 10823; (2) extend for two years after the date on which either or each such project is reinstated the time period during which the licensee must commence project construction, and (3) transfer such license to the Town upon a showing that the transfer is in the public interest. Sets forth the conditions of such transfer, including those for the protection, mitigation, and enhancement of fish and wildlife and related habitat. Directs FERC to supplement the environmental impact statement or similar analysis prepared in connection with the issuance of the original license to examine all new circumstances and information relevant to environmental concerns and bearing on the reinstatement or impact of the license.
Title
Collinsville Renewable Energy Production Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 379 N: 3 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-122. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 3 (Roll no. 340). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5605) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5611-5612) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on agreeing to the Senate amendment to H.R. 316. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Mr. Kinzinger (IL) moved that the House suspend the rules an agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5605-5606) |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3307-3308; text as passed Senate: CR S3308) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-69. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-32. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-02-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H441) |
2013-02-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 316. |
2013-02-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H441-442) |
2013-02-12 | House | Mr. Whitfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 5. |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-7. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Connecticut
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Licensing and registrations
Connecticut
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Licensing and registrations