US HB3160 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-26 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5844)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-26 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5844)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government Shutdown Fairness Act - Requires a reduction in the annual rate of pay of a Member of Congress during a government shutdown equal to the product of 1 day's worth of pay under such annual rate and the number of 24-hour periods during which the government shutdown is in effect. Makes such reduction applicable to days occurring after the date of the general election for federal office held in November 2014. Requires any amount of pay of a Member of Congress in the 113th Congress that is reduced due to a government shutdown to be held in escrow until the last day of the 113th Congress and released for payment to Members at that time.
Title
Government Shutdown Fairness Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5844) |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-09-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3224 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB3236 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB3236 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3160/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3160/BILLS-113hr3160ih.pdf |