US HB318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992 through FY2023 and provides for the Associate Director for Core Science Systems to replace the Associate Director for Geology as the chairperson of the geologic mapping advisory committee.
Title
National Geologic Mapping Act Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Federal officials
Geography and mapping
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Federal officials
Geography and mapping
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr318/BILLS-116hr318ih.pdf |