US HB3211 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguard Tribal Objects of Patrimony Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to double the maximum prison term (from 5 years to 10 years) for persons convicted of selling, purchasing, using for profit, or transporting for sale or profit the human remains of Native Americans or cultural items obtained in violation of the Native American Graves Protection and Repatriation Act. The bill prohibits the export of Native American cultural items that were obtained in violation of the Act, Native American archaeological resources that were obtained in violation of the Archaeological Resources Protection Act of 1979, or Native American objects of antiquity that were obtained in violation of the criminal code. Violators may be subject to fines, imprisonment, or both. The Department of the Interior and the Department of State must each designate a liaison to facilitate and hold trainings and workshops on the voluntary return of human remains or cultural items. Interior must refer individuals and organizations to Indian tribes or Native Hawaiian organizations to facilitate the voluntary return of human remains or cultural items. In addition, Interior must convene a tribal working group consisting of representatives of tribes and Native Hawaiian organizations to provide advice on issues concerning the return of, and illegal trade in, human remains or cultural items.
Title
Safeguard Tribal Objects of Patrimony Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1400 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Federal-Indian relations
Historical and cultural resources
Native Americans
Smuggling and trafficking
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Federal-Indian relations
Historical and cultural resources
Native Americans
Smuggling and trafficking
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3211/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3211/BILLS-115hr3211ih.pdf |