US HB3212 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act to make technical corrections, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Grand Ronde Reservation Act to permit the Department of the Interior to accept real property located within the boundaries of the original 1857 reservation of the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon (comprising land within Polk and Yamhill Counties) that is transferred to the United States by or on behalf of the tribes. Interior must treat applications to take land into trust within the boundaries of the original 1857 reservation as on-reservation trust acquisitions. Gaming is prohibited on such real property taken into trust, except for real property within two miles of a specified gaming facility. All real property taken into trust within those boundaries after September 9, 1988, is part of the tribes' reservation.
Title
To amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act to make technical corrections, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 542. |
2016-07-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-700. |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2015-08-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB818 (Same As) 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-263.