US HB3227 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles XVIII and XIX of the Social Security Act with respect to nursing facility requirements, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring Seniors’ Access to Quality Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] |
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1749 (Same As) 2023-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2429 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2429 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3227/BILLS-118hr3227ih.pdf |