US HB3241 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6242)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-04 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6242)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pay our Guardsmen and Civilian Defense Personnel Act - Amends the Pay Our Military Act (P.L. 113-39) to make FY2014 continuing appropriations for any period during which interim or full-year appropriations for FY2014 are not in effect to provide for pay and allowances to: (1) members of the Armed Forces, including reserve components, who perform inactive-duty training (under such Act only members performing active service) during such period; and (2) all civilian personnel of DOD (and the Department of Homeland Security [DHS] in the case of the Coast Guard), including all military technicians (dual status).
Title
Pay our Guardsmen and Civilian Defense Personnel Act
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6242) |
2013-10-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3210 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-39.
HB3232 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3246 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
HB3232 (Related) 2013-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
HB3246 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Armed forces and national security
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3241/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3241/BILLS-113hr3241ih.pdf |