US HB3266 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of State to submit annual reports reviewing the curriculum used by the Palestinian Authority, and for other purposes.
Title
Peace and Tolerance in Palestinian Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2023-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-11-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3266. |
2023-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-11-01 | House | Mr. Lawler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-10-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0. |
2023-10-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3707 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.