US HB3274 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Became Public Law No: 114-172. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Became Public Law No: 114-172. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4567 Rockbridge Road in Pine Lake, Georgia, as the "Francis Manuel Ortega Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4567 Rockbridge Road in Pine Lake, Georgia, as the "Francis Manuel Ortega Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4567 Rockbridge Road in Pine Lake, Georgia, as the "Francis Manuel Ortega Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-172. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3378) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-03-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1065) |
2016-03-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3274. |
2016-03-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1065-1066) |
2016-03-01 | House | Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Georgia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service