US HB3284 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Default Prevention Act of 2013 - Amends the No Budget, No Pay Act of 2013 (P.L. 113-3) to suspend the public debt limit through December 31, 2014. Revises the special rule relating to obligations issued during the suspension period to provide for an increase in the debt limit, effective January 1, 2015, to the extent that: (1) the face amount of obligations issued and the face amount of obligations whose principal and interest are guaranteed by the federal government (except guaranteed obligations held by the Secretary of the Treasury) outstanding on January 1, 2015, exceeds (2) the face amount of such obligations outstanding on the date of enactment of this Act. Prohibits an obligation from being taken into account unless its issuance was necessary to fund a commitment incurred by the federal government that required payment before January 1, 2015.
Title
Default Prevention Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1569 (Same As) 2013-10-16 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7503-7531)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3284/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3284/BILLS-113hr3284ih.pdf |