US HB3293 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to establish an interagency strike force to ensure that certain Federal land management agencies, including the organizational units of such agencies, prioritize the review of requests for communications use authorizations, and for other purposes.
Title
Expediting Federal Broadband Deployment Reviews Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3293/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3293/BILLS-118hr3293ih.pdf |