US HB3312 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation Business Travel Cards Act of 2011 - Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS), in coordination with the Secretary of State, during the seven-year period ending on September 30, 2018, to issue Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation Business Travel Cards to eligible persons, including business leaders and U.S. government officials actively engaged in Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation (APEC) business, who are in good standing in an international trusted traveler program of DHS. Authorizes the DHS Secretary to collect a fee for the issuance of such cards that is sufficient to offset the costs associated with carrying out this Act. Establishes in the Treasury an APEC Business Travel Card Account into which such fees shall be deposited.
Title
Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation Business Travel Cards Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2011-11-02 | House | See also H.R. 2042 and section Sec. 612 of H.R. 3116 under legislation referred, and S. 1487 under Legislation of Interest. |
2011-11-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1487 (Related) 2011-11-12 - Became Public Law No: 112-54.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
Department of Homeland Security
Federal officials
Free trade and trade barriers
Homeland security
Immigration
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Asia
Department of Homeland Security
Federal officials
Free trade and trade barriers
Homeland security
Immigration
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3312/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3312/BILLS-112hr3312ih.pdf |