US HB3319 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-19)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - Became Public Law No: 111-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-19)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - Became Public Law No: 111-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 440 South Gulling Street in Portola, California, as the "Army Specialist Jeremiah Paul McCleery Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 440 South Gulling Street in Portola, California, as the "Army Specialist Jeremiah Paul McCleery Post Office Building".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | Became Public Law No: 111-131. | |
2010-01-29 | Signed by President. | |
2010-01-20 | Presented to President. | |
2009-12-22 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-12-21 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-12-21 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13660) | |
2009-12-17 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237. | |
2009-12-17 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-12-07 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. | |
2009-10-21 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2009-10-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 791). (text: CR H11469) | |
2009-10-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H11480-11481) | |
2009-10-20 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-10-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3319. | |
2009-10-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11469-11470) | |
2009-10-20 | Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-09-10 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service