US HB3412 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-31 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2106)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-31 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2106)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jerusalem Embassy and Recognition Act of 2009 - States that it is U.S. policy: (1) to recognize Jerusalem as the undivided capital of the State of Israel; and (2) that the U.S. Embassy in Israel should be established in Jerusalem not later than January 1, 2012. Amends the Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 to eliminate the President's authority to waive certain funding limitations for Department of State acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad until the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem has officially opened. Requires any official U.S. document which lists countries and their capital cities to identify Jerusalem as Israel's capital. Limits appropriations that may be obligated in FY2012 for Department acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad until the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem has officially opened. States that for each of FY2010-FY2011, of funds authorized to be appropriated for Department acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad, necessary sums should be made available until expended only for construction and other costs associated with the establishment in Jerusalem of the U.S. Embassy in Israel.
Title
Jerusalem Embassy and Recognition Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Michael McMahon [D-NY] |
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Todd Tiahrt [R-KS] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2106) | |
2009-07-30 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2737 (Related) 2009-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3412/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3412/BILLS-111hr3412ih.pdf |