US HB3463 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-3)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Death Tax Repeal Permanency Act of 2009 - Makes permanent the provisions of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001 (EGTRRA) that repeal the estate and generation skipping transfer taxes and that make reductions in the gift tax.
Title
Death Tax Repeal Permanency Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Bobby Bright [D-AL] |
Rep. Ginny Brown-Waite [R-FL] | Rep. Eric Cantor [R-VA] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY] |
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Parker Griffith [R-AL] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH] | Rep. John Linder [R-GA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] |
Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] |
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Souder [R-IN] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Todd Tiahrt [R-KS] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB533 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1960 (Related) 2009-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB533 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1960 (Related) 2009-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3463/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3463/BILLS-111hr3463ih.pdf |