US HB3583 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government Shutdown Prevention Act of 2011 - Makes specified provisional (automatic) continuing appropriations in the event that any regular appropriation bill for a fiscal year is not enacted before the beginning of such fiscal year, or a joint resolution making continuing appropriations is not in effect. (Thus prevents a federal government shutdown.)
Title
Government Shutdown Prevention Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Timothy Johnson [R-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ] |
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Related) 2011-01-19 - Referred to House Rules
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB439 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1525-1527)
SB784 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB2319 (Related) 2011-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Organization, Efficiency, and Financial Management .
SB439 (Related) 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1525-1527)
SB784 (Related) 2011-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2360)
SB1679 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
SB3434 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3583/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3583/BILLS-112hr3583ih.pdf |