US HB3587 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prescribe procedures for effective consultation and coordination by Federal agencies with federally recognized Tribal Governments regarding Federal Government actions that impact Tribal lands and interests to ensure that meaningful Tribal input is an integral part of the Federal decision-making process.
Title
Requirements, Expectations, and Standard Procedures for Effective Consultation with Tribes Act RESPECT Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-05-20 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3587/BILLS-117hr3587ih.pdf |