US HB359 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a five-year pilot program to assess the effectiveness of addressing veterans' post-deployment mental health and post-traumatic stress disorder symptoms through the therapeutic medium of educating those veterans in the training and handling of service dogs for veterans with disabilities. Requires: (1) the Secretary to carry out the pilot program through contracts with appropriate nongovernmental entities located in close proximity to at least three but no more than five VA medical centers, and (2) each of those entities to be certified in the training and handling of service dogs and to have a training area that would be appropriate for use in educating veterans with mental health conditions in the art and science of service dog training and handling.
Title
Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3016 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Mental health
Service animals
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Mental health
Service animals
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/359/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr359/BILLS-114hr359ih.pdf |