US HB3626 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIHEAP Protection Act - Makes appropriations for FY2012 for the Low-Income Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP). Expresses the sense of Congress that this Act should be implemented in a manner consistent with the Budget Control Act of 2011, and that the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) should: (1) continue and expedite efforts to identify best practices used by LIHEAP grant recipients; (2) provide training and technical assistance to such grant recipients; (3) recommend policy changes, and assess and mitigate risk at governmental levels in order to eliminate waste, fraud, and abuse; and (4) strengthen the Program so all funds reach the households who need them the most.
Title
LIHEAP Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2011-12-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-12-08 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-12-08 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-12-08 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-12-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1961 (Same As) 2011-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8417)
Subjects
Appropriations
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Performance measurement
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Performance measurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3626/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3626/BILLS-112hr3626ih.pdf |