US HB3647 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes December 1, 2010, the effective date for applying U.S. immigration laws to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI). Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to report to Congress regarding such laws' application to the CNMI.
Title
To delay the implementation of the provisions of the Consolidated Natural Resources Act of 2008 applying Federal immigration laws to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law. | |
2009-09-25 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife. | |
2009-09-24 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-09-24 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-09-24 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3770 (Related) 2009-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates
Visas and passports
Government operations and politics
Immigration status and procedures
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3647/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3647/BILLS-111hr3647ih.pdf |