US HB3665 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2017
Title
South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-09-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6645 (Related) 2018-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
SB3374 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3374 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3665/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3665/BILLS-115hr3665ih.pdf |